AZ HB2645 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurers; insolvency; administration
Title
Insurers; insolvency; administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 630 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 631 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 636 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 637 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 676 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 694 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |