AZ HB2650 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
County employees; merit system exemption
Title
County employees; merit system exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | House final reading , voting: (31-28-1-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-1-2-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House third reading , voting: (39-18-3-0) | |
2011-02-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-23 | House Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 3:31 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-24 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-02-09 | House read second time | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |