AZ HB2658 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Chapter 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Chapter 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Federal lands; transfer; study committee
Title
Federal lands; transfer; study committee
Sponsors
Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] | Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] |
Rep. Russell Bowers [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] | Rep. Jeff Weninger [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Chapter 248 | |
2015-04-09 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-04-01 | House | House final reading , voting: (34-25-1-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-04-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-3-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate FMFR Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FMFR Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-03 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-23-0-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House AWL Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-2-0) |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to House AWL Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to House AWL Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |