AZ HB2724 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Egg-laying hens; confinement; regulation
Title
Egg-laying hens; confinement; regulation
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-7-2-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | House | House LAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to House LAG Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |