AZ HB2745 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Defined contribution retirement systems
Title
Defined contribution retirement systems
Sponsors
Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Governor Signed | |
2012-05-03 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-03 | House final reading , voting: (56-0-4-0) | |
2012-05-03 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-05-03 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-05-03 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-05-02 | Transmit to House | |
2012-05-02 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-04-02 | Senate Consent Calendar April 02, 2012 @ 1:05 PM with Objections | |
2012-05-02 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-05-02 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-02 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | House ERA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2012-02-06 | House read second time | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced in House and read first time |