AZ HB2826 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1075
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Chapter 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Chapter 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health boards; AHCCCS; continuation.
Title
Health boards; AHCCCS; continuation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2826 substituted for SB 1075. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2826 substituted for SB 1075. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Senate | Chapter 160 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-6-2-0) |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2826 substituted for SB 1075. Motion carried. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-3-0-0) |
2023-05-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-05-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-05-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-05-09 | House | House read second time |
2023-05-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0) |
2023-05-09 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-5-0-0-0-0) |
2023-05-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-05-08 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2023-05-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1075 (Replaces) 2023-05-15 - Senate additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
Ahcccs (see Also: Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System)
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Board Of Massage Therapy
Continuation
Health Boards
Naturopathic Physicians Medical Board
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Agencies
State Board Of Dental Examiners
State Board Of Optometry
State Government - Title 41
Termination
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Board Of Massage Therapy
Continuation
Health Boards
Naturopathic Physicians Medical Board
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Agencies
State Board Of Dental Examiners
State Board Of Optometry
State Government - Title 41
Termination
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3023.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3023.05 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3023.07 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3023.08 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3023.10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3025.09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3025.10 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3029.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3029.05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3029.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |