AZ HCR2024 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to Senate GOV Committee
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to Senate GOV Committee
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Lieutenant governor; joint ticket
Title
Lieutenant governor; joint ticket
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-19-4-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-0-1-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House ELECT Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |