AZ SB1041 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; conservation easements; applicability
Title
Technical correction; conservation easements; applicability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-19 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-18 | Senate final reading , voting: (24-6-0-0) | |
2011-04-18 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-18 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-18 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-15 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-14 | House third reading , voting: (44-12-4-0) | |
2011-04-12 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House read second time | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (24-5-1-0) | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate CE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |