AZ SB1041 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Simulcast racing; pari-mutuel wagering
Title
Simulcast racing; pari-mutuel wagering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Rural and Economic Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Rural and Economic Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Chapter 267 | |
2015-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-04-03 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-04-03 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (22-34-4-0) |
2015-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House RED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-2-0) |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House RED Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RED Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate NR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate NR Committee |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NR Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |