AZ SB1162 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Home-based business; licensing moratorium
Title
Home-based business; licensing moratorium
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-1-0) |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate FI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate FI Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FI Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |