AZ SB1166 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Condominium associations; technical correction
Title
Condominium associations; technical correction
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-29 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-22 | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (12-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-21 | House read second time | |
2012-03-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-20 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-20 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-28 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-28 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Senate GR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |