AZ SB1239 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - House MAPS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - House MAPS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Deputy constable appointments; website notification
Title
Deputy constable appointments; website notification
Sponsors
Sen. Janae Shamp [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Constables
Deputy Constable Appointments
Justice And Municipal Courts - Title 22
Powers And Duties
Prohibited Acts
Website Notification
Deputy Constable Appointments
Justice And Municipal Courts - Title 22
Powers And Duties
Prohibited Acts
Website Notification