AZ SB1298 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Probation; juvenile; adult
Title
Probation; juvenile; adult
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Chapter 158 | |
2016-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-04 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-30 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-30 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2016-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |