AZ SB1327 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alternative assessment advisory committee
Title
Alternative assessment advisory committee
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 209 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-22 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ade (see Also: Department Of Education)
Alternative Assessment Advisory Committee
Department Of Education (ade)
Emergency
Emergency Clause
Retroactivity
Alternative Assessment Advisory Committee
Department Of Education (ade)
Emergency
Emergency Clause
Retroactivity