AZ SB1387 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Recreational user immunity; access
Title
Recreational user immunity; access
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House MAPS Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate NR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate NR Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NR Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |