AZ SB1491 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-19 - House ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-19 - House ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Literacy; dyslexia; screening; appropriations
Title
Literacy; dyslexia; screening; appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Rep. Michelle Udall [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | House | House ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 501.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |