AZ SB1546 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Eminent domain on federal property.
Title
Eminent domain on federal property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (39-20-1-0) | |
2011-04-13 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-11 | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-3-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-17 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-09 | House read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-28 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-9-1-0) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Senate BSFSS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-3-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |