AZ SB1552 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Vetoed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate tax allocation; sales factor
Title
Corporate tax allocation; sales factor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-04 | House third reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-28 | House Consent Calendar March 28, 2011 @ 3:07 PM | |
2011-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-03-09 | House read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-0-4-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |