AZ SB1572 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; early literacy
Title
Schools; early literacy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - House - Representative Pawlik to include the Pawlik flr amendment (Y: 29 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - House - Representative Pawlik to include the Pawlik flr amendment (Y: 29 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Chapter 434 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-30 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2021-06-28 | House | House motion to amend |
2021-06-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-06-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-06-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-06-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-2-0-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
2022 (h)
Assessment
Certificate
Common Schools (h)
Definitions (h)
Delayed Repeal
Dyslexia (h)
Early Childhood Education (h)
Early Literacy
Education - Title 15
Elementary Education (h)
Evaluation
Fluency (h)
K-3 Reading Program
Kindergarten
Monies
Placement (h)
Program Termination (h)
Promotion (h)
Pupil Enrolls (h)
Reading Deficiency
Reading Proficiency (h)
Reading Program (h)
Reciprocity (h)
Report
Requirements (h)
Retroactivity
Review
Rules (h)
School Instruction
Schools
Screening (h)
State Board Of Education
Teacher (h)
Teaching Certificates (h)
Assessment
Certificate
Common Schools (h)
Definitions (h)
Delayed Repeal
Dyslexia (h)
Early Childhood Education (h)
Early Literacy
Education - Title 15
Elementary Education (h)
Evaluation
Fluency (h)
K-3 Reading Program
Kindergarten
Monies
Placement (h)
Program Termination (h)
Promotion (h)
Pupil Enrolls (h)
Reading Deficiency
Reading Proficiency (h)
Reading Program (h)
Reciprocity (h)
Report
Requirements (h)
Retroactivity
Review
Rules (h)
School Instruction
Schools
Screening (h)
State Board Of Education
Teacher (h)
Teaching Certificates (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 501.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |