AZ SB1743 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2905
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-14 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-14 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; 2024-2025.
Title
Human services; 2024-2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-5-0-0) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2905 (Replaced by) 2024-06-18 - Chapter 217
Subjects
2024-2025
Annual Report
Budget Bills
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Economic Security (des)
Des (see Also: Department Of Economic Security)
Drug Testing
Extended Foster Care Comprehensive Service Model Fund
Extended Foster Care Success Coaching Program
Homeless Shelter And Services Fund
Human Services
Quality Review Committee
Reporting Requirements
Rules
Tanf (see Also: Temporary Assistance For Needy Families)
Tanf Cash Benefits Recipients
Temporary Assistance For Needy Families (tanf)
Transfer Of Monies
Annual Report
Budget Bills
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Economic Security (des)
Des (see Also: Department Of Economic Security)
Drug Testing
Extended Foster Care Comprehensive Service Model Fund
Extended Foster Care Success Coaching Program
Homeless Shelter And Services Fund
Human Services
Quality Review Committee
Reporting Requirements
Rules
Tanf (see Also: Temporary Assistance For Needy Families)
Tanf Cash Benefits Recipients
Temporary Assistance For Needy Families (tanf)
Transfer Of Monies