AZ SCR1001 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Military preservation; land exchanges
Title
Military preservation; land exchanges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Energy and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Energy and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2012-04-25 | Senate final reading , voting: (17-11-2-0) | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-25 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-25 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-23 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-04-23 | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-0-9-0) | |
2012-04-19 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-04-10 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-10 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-09 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | House ENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to House ENR Committee | |
2012-03-05 | House read second time | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned to House ENR Committee | |
2012-03-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-27 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-27 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-5-0-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-07 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-07 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-10 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |