AZ SCR1003 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - House third reading FAILED voting: (16-40-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - House third reading FAILED voting: (16-40-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Interstate medical licensure compact; opposition
Title
Interstate medical licensure compact; opposition
Sponsors
Sen. Kelli Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (16-40-4-0) |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |