AZ SCR1004 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Auditor general; reappointment
Title
Auditor general; reappointment
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (01/22/15) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (01/22/15) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2015-03-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-4-0) |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |