AZ SCR1019 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-11 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-11 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State appropriation limit; reduction
Title
State appropriation limit; reduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | House third reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to House Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to House Committee | |
2011-01-26 | House read second time | |
2011-03-11 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-10 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |