CA AB1087 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 39719 and 39719.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to high-speed rail.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: high-speed rail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39719 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39719.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |