CA AB1087 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44270 of, and to add Section 44268.2 to, the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Teacher credentialing: services credential with a specialization in occupational therapy or physical therapy services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44268.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 48315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1087 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1087 |