CA AB121 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 414, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 414, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11004, 11323.2, and 11323.4 of, to amend and repeal Section 11323.3 of, and to add Section 11323.1 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, to repeal Section 46 of Chapter 27 of the Statutes of 2019, and to amend the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019) by adding Item 5180-490 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to social services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Social services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 121 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB121 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 121 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB121 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 121 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 414, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3469.). |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3466.) |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 2902.). |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (September 10). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.) |
2019-09-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1188.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11323.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11323.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11323.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11323.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |