PA SB1160 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 38 (Holidays and Observances) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veteran recognition, providing for Vietnam War Veterans Day.
Title
In veteran recognition, providing for Vietnam War Veterans Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1160 PN 1524, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2024-07-10 | House | In the House |
2024-07-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-06-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |