CA AB1214 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 517, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 517, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 16032 to the Insurance Code, relating to fire insurance.
Title
Fire insurance: underwriters' corps: liability.
Sponsors
Asm. Pedro Nava [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1214 NAVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent #15 AB1214 Nava By Lowenthal (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1214 NAVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent #15 AB1214 Nava By Lowenthal (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1214 NAVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 517, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2009-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2749.) | |
2009-08-25 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1928.) | |
2009-08-20 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-17 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-07-09 | To third reading. | |
2009-07-02 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-26 | Read second time, amended, and to third reading. | |
2009-06-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2009-05-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1237.) | |
2009-04-23 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22). | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |