CA AB125 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26211, 26212, 26213, 26214, 26215, 26216, 26217, 26227, 26233, and 26240 of, and to add Sections 26205.5 and 26227.2 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to energy, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Clean Energy Job Creation Program and citizen oversight board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 125 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 125 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 20). |
2017-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 1571.) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1605.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26205.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 26211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26227.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 26233 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |