CA AB1272 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1797.259 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Emergency medical services: trauma center: helicopter
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1272 HILL Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1272 HILL Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-06-16 | Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and EQ. | |
2010-06-15 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-06-14 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2010-06-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-05-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-07-08 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-07-07 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-07-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2009-06-24 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-06-17 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and EQ. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1626.) | |
2009-05-14 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 11). | |
2009-05-06 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |
2009-04-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-21 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and TRANS. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |