CA AB1272 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1048.1 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Criminal procedure: trial schedule conflicts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1272 Grove (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Assembly - AB 1272 GROVE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Assembly - AB 1272 GROVE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4644.). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-05-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3524.) |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. (Page 3426.) |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12). |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 729 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 6211.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 6250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 6251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1048.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 268 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 368.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 836 | Amended Code | Citation Text |