CA AB133 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 60063 to the Education Code, relating to instructional materials.
Title
Instructional materials: digital format.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-08 - Assembly - AB 133 HAGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB133 Hagman By Liu (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 133 HAGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB133 Hagman By Liu (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 133 HAGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2460.). |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1690.). |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1008.) |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2013-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 60063 | New Code | See Bill Text |