CA AB1463 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 20.2 (commencing with Section 69996) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, and to add Section 17131.12 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to student financial aid, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Student financial aid: California Covenants Program: tuition certificates: gross income exclusion.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1463 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1732.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and B. & P. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69996 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13558 | New Code | See Bill Text |