CA AB148 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-17 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-17 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 33700) to Part 20 of Division 2 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to education.
Title
Education.
Sponsors
Asm. Joe Coto [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 148 COTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 1865.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-01 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-03-19 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 18). | |
2009-03-11 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-03-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-01-23 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. | |
2009-01-22 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33700 | New Code | See Bill Text |