CA AB151 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 38561 and 38566 of, to add Section 38572 to, and to add and repeal Section 38568 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: market-based compliance mechanisms: scoping plan: report.
Sponsors
Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Burke. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 24). |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38561 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38562 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38566 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38567 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38568 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38572 | New Code | See Bill Text |