CA AB151 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19829.9850, 19829.9851, 19829.9852, 19878.5, 20677.5, 20683.81.3, and 22944.5 of, and to add Sections 19829.9853 and 20640 to, the Government Code, and to add Section 4811 to the Labor Code, relating to state employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State employment: State Bargaining units: agreements: compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 151 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB151 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 151 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB151 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 151 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Senate rules suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2022-08-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1750.) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 487.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19829.9850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9852 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9853 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19878.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20640 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20677.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20683.81.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22944.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4811 | New Code | See Bill Text |