CA AB1521 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1359.1 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10119.4 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: solicitation.
Sponsors
Asm. Dave Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1521 JONES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Insurance (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1521 JONES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Insurance (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-27 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2009-08-24 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-07-15 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-14 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 8). | |
2009-07-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-06-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 1753.) | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20). | |
2009-04-30 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 22). | |
2009-04-20 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (April 14). | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and INS. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |