CA AB1521 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65863.10 and 65863.11 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use: notice of proposed change: assisted housing developments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 1521 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1521 Bloom et al. By Wiener (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1521 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1521 BLOOM Assembly Second Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1521 Bloom et al. By Wiener (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1521 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1521 BLOOM Assembly Second Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3516.). |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3507.) |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2956.). |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 17). |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 2059.) |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 1990.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 1852.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1851.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65863.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65863.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |