CA AB1549 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-11 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-11 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 66281.6 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: sexual assault: audits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1549 RENDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1549 RENDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-06 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4598.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66281.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66281.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |