CA AB1563 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 26150) of Division 5 of Title 4 of Part 6 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: license to carry concealed weapons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Assembly | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |