CA AB1563 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10509.959 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Life insurance policy illustrations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1563 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1156.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 1. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10509.959 | Amended Code | Citation Text |