CA AB157 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50474.21 and 50474.3 of, to add Sections 6254.36 and 7929.011 to, and to add and repeal Article 9.5 (commencing with Section 12100.100) and Article 15 (commencing with Section 12100.160) of Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 50720.2, 50720.8, 53559, and 53559.1 of, and to add Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 51530) to Part 3 of Division 31 of, the Health and Safety Code, to add and repeal Section 10326.3 of the Public Contract Code, and to amend Section 1685 of the Vehicle Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 157 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB157 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 157 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB157 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 157 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Senate rules suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2022-08-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1750.) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 30). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 490.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100.100 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12100.160 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50474.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50474.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6254.36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 7929.011 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50720.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50720.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 51530 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53559 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53559.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10326.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 1685 | Amended Code | Citation Text |