CA AB158 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21628 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to secondhand goods.
Title
Secondhand dealers and coin dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-22 - Senate - Special Consent #9 AB158 Mendoza By Calderon (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - AB 158 MENDOZA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - AB 158 MENDOZA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-07-01 | Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment. | |
2009-06-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2009-06-22 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-22 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1376.) | |
2009-06-16 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-23 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-03-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 624.) | |
2009-03-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-03-17 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17). | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-01-28 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | |
2009-01-27 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21628 | Amended Code | Citation Text |