CA AB163 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8030.2, 8030.6, 11546.45, and 19821.1 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 8260 and 9114.5 of, and to amend and renumber Section 7902.2 of, the Government Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 163 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB163 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 163 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB163 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 163 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3050.). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3049.) |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2575.). |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (September 7). |
2021-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2303.) |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Senate rules suspended. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2302.) |
2021-07-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 493.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 11546.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19821.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8030.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8030.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 9114.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |