CA AB1762 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 479, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 479, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9, 357.5, 2170, 3025.5, 3025.7, 4005, 4005.6, 13107, 14212, 15621, 15646, 16401, 16421 of, and to repeal Section 4007 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1762 Elections Concurrence in Senate Amendments By PELLERIN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1762 ELECTIONS (Pellerin) By Glazer (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 1762 Elections Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1762 ELECTIONS (Pellerin) By Glazer (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 1762 Elections Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 479, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3052.). |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.) |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2396.). |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1367.) |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 13. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15621 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15646 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 16401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 16421 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3025.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3025.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 357.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 4005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 4005.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 4007 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |