CA AB2985 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 242 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to courts.
Title
Courts: mental health advisement.
Sponsors
Asm. Gregg Hart [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-08 - Assembly - AB 2985 Hart Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2985 Hart (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2985 Hart Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2985 Hart (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2985 Hart Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5090.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 242 | New Code | See Bill Text |