CA AB1919 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12997 and 12997.5 of, and to add Section 12999.6 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to pesticides.
Title
Pesticides: enforcement actions: civil penalty: judicial review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 12997 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 12997.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 12999.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |