CA AB1950 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14502.1, 47604, 47605, 47605.6, and 47607 of, and to add Section 47630.6 to, the Education Code, relating to charter schools.
Title
Charter School Facility Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1950 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-06-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 5576.) | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-29 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |