CA AB1950 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 569, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 569, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10085.6 and 10130 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 2944.7 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 802 of the Penal Code, relating to business.
Title
Prohibited business practices: enforcement.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1950 DAVIS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1950 Davis By Lowenthal (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1950 DAVIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1950 Davis By Lowenthal (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1950 DAVIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 569, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 6359.). | |
2012-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4704.). | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |
2012-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 5092.) | |
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-22 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-05-09 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 17). | |
2012-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 10085.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 10130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2944.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 27388 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |